THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-500 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIO MENDES BOTELHO FILHO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIO MENDES BOTELHO FILHO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MENDES BOTELHO FILHO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais (UFMG) Faculdade de Medicina, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Urology
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Urology
02 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Urology
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 02 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 01 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024