THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ruhr-Universität Bochum Medizinische Fakultät, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169462094
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Ruhr-Universität Bochum Medizinische Fakultät, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Radiation Oncology
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169462094
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINHARDT KRCEK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KRCEK is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KRCEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KRCEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KRCEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KRCEK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KRCEK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REINHARDT KRCEK may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KRCEK is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KRCEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KRCEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KRCEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KRCEK ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KRCEK ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruhr-Universität Bochum Medizinische Fakultät, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
13 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 13 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 12 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024