THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:10:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Luke's Medical Center College of Medicine - William H. Quasha Memorial (SLMCCM-WHQM), 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Neurology
Room A442, 4th floor
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 6100 Ext. 3448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: St. Luke's Medical Center College of Medicine - William H. Quasha Memorial (SLMCCM-WHQM), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Neurology
Room A442, 4th floor
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 6100 Ext. 3448
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Philippines

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FERRON FACTOR OCAMPO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. OCAMPO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. OCAMPO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OCAMPO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OCAMPO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. OCAMPO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. OCAMPO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FERRON FACTOR OCAMPO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. OCAMPO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. OCAMPO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. OCAMPO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. OCAMPO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. OCAMPO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. OCAMPO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Luke's Medical Center College of Medicine - William H. Quasha Memorial (SLMCCM-WHQM), 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024