THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:29:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5283 Rutherford Road
Rutherford Medical Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L4H 2P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052648311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5283 Rutherford Road
Rutherford Medical Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L4H 2P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052648311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 18 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 May 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 15 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAYA MISHRA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAYA MISHRA may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 May 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 May 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 17 Nov 2027