THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:36:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinton Family Health Team
105 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huronlea Home for the Aged
820 Turnberry Street
Brussels Ontario N0G 1H0
Phone: (519) 887-9267
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huronview
77722 London Road
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clinton Family Health Team
105 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huronlea Home for the Aged
820 Turnberry Street
Brussels Ontario N0G 1H0
Phone: (519) 887-9267
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Clinton Public Hospital
98 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3440
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Huronview
77722 London Road
Clinton Ontario N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3451
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Oct 2024
08 Oct 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 09 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Oct 08 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FARZANEH EBRAHIMI FARD may practise family medicine with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Clinton Family Health Team in Clinton, Ontario;

(ii) Clinton Public Hospital in Clinton, Ontario;

(iii) Huronlea Home for the Aged in Brussels, Ontario;

(iv) Huronview in Clinton, Ontario; and

(v) in accordance with Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD signed on December 14, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance; or

(ii) when Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 09 October, 2024, and will expire on or before 08 October, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FARZANEH EBRAHIMI FARD may practise family medicine with the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Clinton Family Health Team in Clinton, Ontario;

(ii) Clinton Public Hospital in Clinton, Ontario;

(iii) Huronlea Home for the Aged in Brussels, Ontario;

(iv) Huronview in Clinton, Ontario; and

(v) in accordance with Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD signed on December 14, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance; or

(ii) when Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. EBRAHIMI FARD’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 09 October, 2024, and will expire on or before 08 October, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 08 Oct 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024