THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:34:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Centennial Family Health Centre
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke Ontario K8A 0C6
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa Centennial Family Health Centre
Petawawa Ontario K8H 3H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay St
Pembroke Ontario K8A 0C6
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2024
18 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 18 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HADI NAMAZI may practise family medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Petawawa Centennial Family Health Centre in Petawawa, Ontario;

(ii) Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario; and

(iii) in accordance with Dr. Namazi’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Namazi signed on December 13, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on September 18, 2027, or when Dr. Namazi’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. NAMAZI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. NAMAZI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 18 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HADI NAMAZI may practise family medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Petawawa Centennial Family Health Centre in Petawawa, Ontario;

(ii) Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario; and

(iii) in accordance with Dr. Namazi’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Namazi signed on December 13, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on September 18, 2027, or when Dr. Namazi’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. NAMAZI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. NAMAZI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 18 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 May 2024