THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:04:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: Modi, Karishma Prashantkumar (Used Until: 08 Jan 2024)
Medical School: Pramukhswami Medical College, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elizabeth Street
170
Toronto Ontario M5G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +14168345314
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Modi, Karishma Prashantkumar (Used Until: 08 Jan 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Pramukhswami Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Elizabeth Street
170
Toronto Ontario M5G
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +14168345314
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARISHMA NIKHIL BUCH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BUCH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BUCH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUCH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BUCH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BUCH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BUCH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARISHMA NIKHIL BUCH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. BUCH is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. BUCH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BUCH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. BUCH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. BUCH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. BUCH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pramukhswami Medical College, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Dec 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024