THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yonsei University College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Odette Cancer Centre - Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: Yonsei University College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Odette Cancer Centre - Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JA YOON HEO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HEO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HEO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HEO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HEO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HEO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HEO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JA YOON HEO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HEO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. HEO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HEO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HEO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HEO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HEO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 28 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yonsei University College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
29 Jul 2025 to 14 Apr 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
15 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Apr 2025 to 14 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
08 Jul 2024 to 31 Mar 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
15 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 29 Jul 2025 to 14 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 28 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 15 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Apr 2025 to 14 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 08 Jul 2024 to 31 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 07 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 15 Apr 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 28 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 28 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2024