THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:14:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital
Medical Imaging
Box 232
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +13439661811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Road
The Ottawa Hospital
Medical Imaging
Box 232
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +13439661811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SABRI H RAJEH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RAJEH is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. RAJEH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJEH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAJEH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. RAJEH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. RAJEH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SABRI H RAJEH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. RAJEH is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. RAJEH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. RAJEH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. RAJEH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. RAJEH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. RAJEH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Taibah University College of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
25 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 24 Aug 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 25 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 24 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024