THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:32:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602 - 500 University Avenue
University of Toronto PGME
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602 - 500 University Avenue
University of Toronto PGME
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALID HASSAN ABDULLAH AL HAMADANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL HAMADANI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AL HAMADANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL HAMADANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL HAMADANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL HAMADANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL HAMADANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALID HASSAN ABDULLAH AL HAMADANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. AL HAMADANI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. AL HAMADANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL HAMADANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. AL HAMADANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. AL HAMADANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. AL HAMADANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
19 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 18 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Surgery
DATE: 19 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 18 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025