THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:45:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Abierta Interamericana Facultad de Medicina y Ciencias de la Salud, Sede Buenos Aires, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Abierta Interamericana Facultad de Medicina y Ciencias de la Salud, Sede Buenos Aires, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTÍN JOSÉ REIBEL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. REIBEL is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. REIBEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REIBEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REIBEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. REIBEL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. REIBEL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTÍN JOSÉ REIBEL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. REIBEL is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. REIBEL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. REIBEL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. REIBEL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. REIBEL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. REIBEL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Abierta Interamericana Facultad de Medicina y Ciencias de la Salud, Sede Buenos Aires, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Urology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Urology
26 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Urology
01 Aug 2024 to 25 Oct 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 26 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Urology
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 25 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2024