THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:37:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: Alsenz, Anna Lara (Used Until: 05 Feb 2024)
Medical School: Christian-Albrechts-Universität zu Kiel Medizinische Fakultät, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
General Surgery -Trauma Program
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Alsenz, Anna Lara (Used Until: 05 Feb 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Christian-Albrechts-Universität zu Kiel Medizinische Fakultät, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
General Surgery -Trauma Program
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Feb 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 07 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 Feb 2025
18 Feb 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 20 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 18 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANNA LARA LAVALLÉE may practise general surgery with The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus in Ottawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LAVALLÉE’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. LAVALLÉE’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. LAVALLÉE’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 February, 2025, and will expire on or before 18 February, 2028, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANNA LARA LAVALLÉE may practise general surgery with The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus in Ottawa, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LAVALLÉE’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. LAVALLÉE’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. LAVALLÉE’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 20 February, 2025, and will expire on or before 18 February, 2028, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian-Albrechts-Universität zu Kiel Medizinische Fakultät, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 18 Feb 2028

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025