THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:52:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital of Sick Children
Department of pediatric Hematology Oncology
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital of Sick Children
Department of pediatric Hematology Oncology
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAFAA AHMED A ALJIZANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALJIZANI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALJIZANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALJIZANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALJIZANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALJIZANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALJIZANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WAFAA AHMED A ALJIZANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALJIZANI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALJIZANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALJIZANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALJIZANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALJIZANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALJIZANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024