THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:38:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Jalan Tan Tock Seng
Tan Tock Seng Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
Singapore 308433
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN, MANDARIN
Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Jalan Tan Tock Seng
Tan Tock Seng Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
Singapore 308433
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AE RA KEE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KEE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KEE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KEE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AE RA KEE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KEE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. KEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KEE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KEE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yong Loo Lin School of Medicine, National University of Singapore, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024