THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:09:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Newcastle Faculty of Health and Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Gastroenterology
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Newcastle Faculty of Health and Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Elizabeth St
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Gastroenterology
Toronto ON M5G 1E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN EDWARD MOLE O'DONNELL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. O'DONNELL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. O'DONNELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. O'DONNELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. O'DONNELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. O'DONNELL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. O'DONNELL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN EDWARD MOLE O'DONNELL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. O'DONNELL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. O'DONNELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. O'DONNELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. O'DONNELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. O'DONNELL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. O'DONNELL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Newcastle Faculty of Health and Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
06 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Gastroenterology
14 Jul 2024 to 05 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 06 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Pediatric Gastroenterology
DATE: 14 Jul 2024 to 05 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2024