THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:06:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Auckland Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Auckland Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUAN KONG KOH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOH is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. KOH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KOH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KOH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUAN KONG KOH may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KOH is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. KOH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KOH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KOH shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. KOH ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. KOH ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Auckland Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
27 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Aug 2024 to 26 Sep 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 27 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 26 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2024