THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:03:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Blumentritt
Chinese General Hospital and Medical Center
Department of Anesthesiology
Second Floor - Near Main Operating Room
Manila Metro Manila 1014
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 09253081130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Blumentritt
Chinese General Hospital and Medical Center
Department of Anesthesiology
Second Floor - Near Main Operating Room
Manila Metro Manila 1014
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 09253081130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNA MARIE SARIAL LIU may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LIU is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LIU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LIU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LIU ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LIU ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHANNA MARIE SARIAL LIU may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LIU is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LIU shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LIU is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LIU shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LIU ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LIU ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025