THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4- 1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4- 1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ RAJEH M ALZAHRANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALZAHRANI is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ALZAHRANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALZAHRANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALZAHRANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALZAHRANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALZAHRANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ RAJEH M ALZAHRANI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALZAHRANI is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ALZAHRANI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALZAHRANI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALZAHRANI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. ALZAHRANI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. ALZAHRANI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
25 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Sep 2024 to 24 Nov 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 25 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Sep 2024 to 24 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2024