THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:10:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 University Ave
Toronto ON M5J 2P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE CHARISMA JOVER LABORTE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LABORTE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LABORTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LABORTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LABORTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LABORTE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LABORTE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 22 September, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIE CHARISMA JOVER LABORTE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. LABORTE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LABORTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LABORTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LABORTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. LABORTE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. LABORTE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 22 September, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
16 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
23 Sep 2024 to 15 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 16 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 15 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 22 Sep 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 22 Sep 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2024