THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:07:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Hassan II de Casablanca Faculté de Médecine et de Pharmacie, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Obstetrical Anesthesia
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Hassan II de Casablanca Faculté de Médecine et de Pharmacie, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Ave
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Obstetrical Anesthesia
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REDA HAFIANE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HAFIANE is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. HAFIANE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAFIANE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HAFIANE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HAFIANE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HAFIANE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REDA HAFIANE may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. HAFIANE is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. HAFIANE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HAFIANE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. HAFIANE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. HAFIANE ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. HAFIANE ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Hassan II de Casablanca Faculté de Médecine et de Pharmacie, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025