THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:28:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Avenue
Univerisity Hospital Network-6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169462090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 University Avenue
Univerisity Hospital Network-6th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169462090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARE O'CONNELL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. O'CONNELL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. O'CONNELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. O'CONNELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. O'CONNELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. O'CONNELL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. O'CONNELL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARE O'CONNELL may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. O'CONNELL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. O'CONNELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. O'CONNELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. O'CONNELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. O'CONNELL ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. O'CONNELL ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Trinity College Dublin School of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Urology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Urology
26 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Urology
03 Oct 2024 to 25 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Urology
DATE: 26 Dec 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Urology
DATE: 03 Oct 2024 to 25 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024