THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 21:08:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVIEL SHETRIT may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHETRIT is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SHETRIT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHETRIT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHETRIT shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHETRIT ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHETRIT ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVIEL SHETRIT may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHETRIT is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SHETRIT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHETRIT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHETRIT shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHETRIT ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHETRIT ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
09 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 09 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025