Medical School:
Katholieke Universiteit Leuven (KULeuven) Faculteit Geneeskunde, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine |
01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine |
24 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine |
01 Sep 2024 to 23 Nov 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE:
01 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE:
24 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE:
01 Sep 2024 to 23 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto