Medical School:
University of the East/Ramon Magsaysay Memorial Medical Center College of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
02 Aug 2025 to 31 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology |
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology |
01 Sep 2024 to 23 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
02 Aug 2025 to 31 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE:
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Sep 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto