THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:20:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tecnológico de Monterrey Escuela de Medicina Monterrey, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Avenida San Fernando
Instituto Nacional de Cancerología / Departamento de Radioterapia / Braquiterapia
Belisario Domínguez Section 16
Mexico City Mexico City 14080
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5614114415
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Vasco de Quiroga
Instituto Nacional de Ciencias Médicas y Nutrición Salvador Zubirán
Department of Haematology and Oncology / Radiotherapy and Medical Physics Service
Mexico City Mexico City Mexico 14080
Phone: (+52)5614114415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tecnológico de Monterrey Escuela de Medicina Monterrey, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Avenida San Fernando
Instituto Nacional de Cancerología / Departamento de Radioterapia / Braquiterapia
Belisario Domínguez Section 16
Mexico City Mexico City 14080
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5614114415
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15 Vasco de Quiroga
Instituto Nacional de Ciencias Médicas y Nutrición Salvador Zubirán
Department of Haematology and Oncology / Radiotherapy and Medical Physics Service
Mexico City Mexico City Mexico 14080
Phone: (+52)5614114415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ILEANA PEREZ ALVAREZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 11 August, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ILEANA PEREZ ALVAREZ may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. PEREZ ALVAREZ ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 11 August, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tecnológico de Monterrey Escuela de Medicina Monterrey, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
10 Aug 2025 to 11 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 09 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
01 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
12 Aug 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 10 Aug 2025 to 11 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 09 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 01 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
DATE: 12 Aug 2024 to 31 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 11 Aug 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 11 Aug 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2024