Medical School:
King's College London GKT School of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025 |
Western University |
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery |
25 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Aug 2024 to 24 Oct 2024 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
25 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Aug 2024 to 24 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University