THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:31:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mendes Gomes, Luciana Beatriz (Used Until: 10 Mar 2024)
Medical School: Pontifícia Universidade Católica de Goiás (PUC Goiás), 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Via L2 Sul
Hospital Sirio Libanes
SGAS 613
N 94
Brasília Distrito Federal 70200-730
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +5562996979811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Mendes Gomes, Luciana Beatriz (Used Until: 10 Mar 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Pontifícia Universidade Católica de Goiás (PUC Goiás), 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Via L2 Sul
Hospital Sirio Libanes
SGAS 613
N 94
Brasília Distrito Federal 70200-730
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +5562996979811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIANA BEATRIZ MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUCIANA BEATRIZ MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. MENDES GOMES SIQUEIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontifícia Universidade Católica de Goiás (PUC Goiás), 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2024