THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 20:15:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Libre de Bruxelles Faculté de Médecine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Elizabeth Street
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of diagnostic and interventional radiology
PSC Floor 14
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164350402
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 16 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Université Libre de Bruxelles Faculté de Médecine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 175 Elizabeth Street
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of diagnostic and interventional radiology
PSC Floor 14
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164350402
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 16 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Aug 2024
15 Aug 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 15 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AURÉLIE JACQUELINE C D'HONDT may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. D'HONDT holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. D'HONDT no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. D'HONDT’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. D'HONDT’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 August, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 August, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AURÉLIE JACQUELINE C D'HONDT may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, University of Toronto, in which Dr. D'HONDT holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. D'HONDT no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. D'HONDT’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. D'HONDT’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 August, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 15 August, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Libre de Bruxelles Faculté de Médecine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 15 Aug 2031