Medical School:
Qassim University College of Medicine, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology |
08 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology |
01 Jul 2025 to 07 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology |
31 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology |
08 Aug 2024 to 30 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE:
08 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 07 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology
DATE:
31 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
DATE:
08 Aug 2024 to 30 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto