THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/04/25 10:07:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4502 Calzada de Tlalpan
Instituto Nacional de Enfermedades Respiratorias
Anesthesiology Service
Mexico City Mexico City 14080
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Puente de Piedra
Hospital Medica Sur
Mexico City Mexico City Mexico 14050
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4502 Calzada de Tlalpan
Instituto Nacional de Enfermedades Respiratorias
Anesthesiology Service
Mexico City Mexico City 14080
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Puente de Piedra
Hospital Medica Sur
Mexico City Mexico City Mexico 14050
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICARDO ELI GUIDO GUERRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GUIDO GUERRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. GUIDO GUERRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GUIDO GUERRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GUIDO GUERRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GUIDO GUERRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. GUIDO GUERRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICARDO ELI GUIDO GUERRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GUIDO GUERRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. GUIDO GUERRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GUIDO GUERRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GUIDO GUERRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. GUIDO GUERRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. GUIDO GUERRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2024