Medical School:
Saba University School of Medicine, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology |
26 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology |
01 Jul 2025 to 25 Aug 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology |
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Ottawa |
AVP - Dermatology |
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024 |
University of Ottawa |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology
DATE:
26 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 25 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
DATE:
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Dermatology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Ottawa