THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:10:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dubai Medical College for Girls, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
605
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dubai Medical College for Girls, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
605
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHAH MATAR MOHAMED MOBARAK ALHMOUDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALHMOUDI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALHMOUDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHMOUDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALHMOUDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALHMOUDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALHMOUDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHAH MATAR MOHAMED MOBARAK ALHMOUDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALHMOUDI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALHMOUDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHMOUDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALHMOUDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALHMOUDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALHMOUDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 July, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dubai Medical College for Girls, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Jul 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Jul 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2024