Medical School:
University of Debrecen Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology |
16 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology |
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Aug 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology |
09 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
AVP - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology |
16 Aug 2024 to 08 Nov 2024 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE:
16 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE:
09 Nov 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE:
16 Aug 2024 to 08 Nov 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University