Medical School:
Lancaster University Medical School, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
30 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 29 Jul 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
23 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Oct 2024 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
30 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 29 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
23 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University