Medical School:
McMaster University, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
26 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 25 Aug 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
14 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry |
01 Jul 2024 to 13 Jan 2025 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
26 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 25 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
14 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 13 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University