THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:54:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade de Brasília (UnB) Faculdade de Medicina, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidade de Brasília (UnB) Faculdade de Medicina, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 20-1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDUARDO PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDUARDO PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PIMENTA RIBEIRO PONTES ALMEIDA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade de Brasília (UnB) Faculdade de Medicina, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024