THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:03:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2024
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 West 5th Street
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioral Neurosciences
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 36291
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2024

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 West 5th Street
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioral Neurosciences
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 36291
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMIN DEEPAKA WANASUNDARA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WANASUNDARA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. WANASUNDARA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WANASUNDARA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. WANASUNDARA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WANASUNDARA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WANASUNDARA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHAMIN DEEPAKA WANASUNDARA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. WANASUNDARA is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. WANASUNDARA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. WANASUNDARA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. WANASUNDARA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. WANASUNDARA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. WANASUNDARA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
07 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 06 Aug 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
19 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
AVP - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 18 Jan 2025
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 07 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 06 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 19 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 18 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024