Medical School:
Moi University School of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
AVP - Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024 |
Northern Ontario School of Medicine |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Northern Ontario School of Medicine