THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:04:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana Bogotá Facultad de Medicina, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana Bogotá Facultad de Medicina, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGIE KATHERINE PUERTO NINO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PUERTO NINO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PUERTO NINO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PUERTO NINO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PUERTO NINO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PUERTO NINO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PUERTO NINO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGIE KATHERINE PUERTO NINO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PUERTO NINO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. PUERTO NINO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PUERTO NINO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. PUERTO NINO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PUERTO NINO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PUERTO NINO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana Bogotá Facultad de Medicina, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
AVP - Urology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Urology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025