THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 07:29:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dr. D.Y. Patil Medical College, Hospital and Research Centre, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 King's College Circle
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Dr. D.Y. Patil Medical College, Hospital and Research Centre, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 King's College Circle
Toronto Ontario M5S 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUPAM GOYAL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GOYAL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. GOYAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GOYAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GOYAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GOYAL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GOYAL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANUPAM GOYAL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GOYAL is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. GOYAL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GOYAL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GOYAL shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GOYAL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GOYAL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dr. D.Y. Patil Medical College, Hospital and Research Centre, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
AVP - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Diagnostic and Molecular Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024