THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:06:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2024
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, THAI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray Street
4th floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165865159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, THAI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2024

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Murray Street
4th floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165865159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THARIT CHAROENPANON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAROENPANON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHAROENPANON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAROENPANON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHAROENPANON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHAROENPANON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHAROENPANON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THARIT CHAROENPANON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAROENPANON is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. CHAROENPANON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAROENPANON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHAROENPANON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHAROENPANON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHAROENPANON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
07 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 06 Jul 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 07 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 06 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2024