Medical School:
Edinburgh Medical School, College of Medicine and Veterinary Medicine, University of Edinburgh, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
28 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 27 Jul 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
28 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 27 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto