Medical School:
Saint James School of Medicine Anguilla, 2021
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine |
18 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 17 Nov 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine |
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
AVP - Internal Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
18 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 17 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE:
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University