THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:34:59 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sylhet M.A.G. Osmani Medical College, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI
Medical School: Sylhet M.A.G. Osmani Medical College, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIRA MURSHED CHOUDHURY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHOUDHURY is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. CHOUDHURY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHOUDHURY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHOUDHURY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHOUDHURY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHOUDHURY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIRA MURSHED CHOUDHURY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHOUDHURY is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. CHOUDHURY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHOUDHURY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. CHOUDHURY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. CHOUDHURY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. CHOUDHURY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sylhet M.A.G. Osmani Medical College, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
AVP - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024