THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 04:22:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3E2
Phone: 6479097620
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Carrie Street
Strathroy Ontario N7G 3E2
Phone: 6479097620
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIDA FATIMA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FATIMA is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. FATIMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FATIMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FATIMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FATIMA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FATIMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIDA FATIMA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FATIMA is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. FATIMA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FATIMA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. FATIMA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FATIMA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FATIMA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025