THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:10:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2024
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences; Neurosurgery
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital & Children's Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences; Neurosurgery
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2030
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2030
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2024

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 339 Windermere Road
London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences; Neurosurgery
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital & Children's Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences; Neurosurgery
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 01 Jan 2030
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2030
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMAN ARFAIE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ARFAIE is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ARFAIE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ARFAIE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ARFAIE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ARFAIE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ARFAIE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMAN ARFAIE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ARFAIE is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. ARFAIE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ARFAIE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ARFAIE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ARFAIE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ARFAIE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025