Medical School:
University of Buckingham Medical School, 2024
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
23 Sep 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 22 Sep 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University