Medical School:
Universitas Gadjah Mada Sekip Fakultas Kedokteran, Kesehatan Masyarakat dan Keperawatan, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine |
16 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Nov 2025 |
Western University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine |
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Western University |
AVP - Family Medicine |
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024 |
Western University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE:
16 Nov 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Nov 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE:
24 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Western University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Family Medicine
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 23 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Western University