Medical School:
Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology |
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology |
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology |
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology |
01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE:
01 Aug 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Jul 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE:
24 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE:
01 Aug 2024 to 23 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto