THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 03:31:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: Orlov, Elizabeta (Used Until: 05 Apr 2024)
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Orlov, Elizabeta (Used Until: 05 Apr 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETA SHPRITS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHPRITS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SHPRITS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHPRITS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHPRITS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHPRITS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHPRITS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETA SHPRITS may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SHPRITS is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SHPRITS shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SHPRITS is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SHPRITS shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SHPRITS ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SHPRITS ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ruth and Bruce Rappaport Faculty of Medicine, Technion Israel Institute of Technology, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
02 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 23 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 02 Jul 2024 to 22 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025